GA HB722 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to provide for a patient registry program for the use of medical cannabis; to authorize rule making; to establish duties of patients, designated caregivers, physicians, and manufacturers of medical cannabis; to establish a medical cannabis tracking system; to provide for confidentiality of records; to establish patient protections; to impose penalties; to provide for nursing facilities; to establish fees; to establish a task force; to require impact assessment of medical cannabis therapeutic research; to require reports and audits; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; patient registry program for the use of medical cannabis; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Dee Dawkins-Haigler [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #665 (Y: 152 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-12 | House | House Hopper |
2016-01-06 | House | House Prefiled |