GA HB717 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to prestige license plates and special license plates for certain persons and vehicles, so as to provide for a woman veteran's license plate; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; women veterans; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. John Yates [R] | Rep. Earnest Smith [D] | Rep. Darryl Jordan [D] |
Rep. Henry Howard [D] | Rep. Keisha Waites [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House Hopper |
2015-12-14 | House | House Prefiled |