GA HB712 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Pickens County, approved June 2, 2010 (Ga. L. 2010, p. 3704), so as to clarify the effective dates of the repeal of certain Acts due to a scrivener's error; to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pickens County; Board of Commissioners; clarify dates; change description of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #470 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-13 - House - House Vote #427 - Local Calendar (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-01-13 - House - House Vote #427 - Local Calendar (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Effective Date | |
2012-02-27 | Act 278 | |
2012-02-27 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-02-27 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-23 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-01-13 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-01-13 | House Third Readers | |
2012-01-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-12 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-11 | House First Readers |