GA HB698 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting and supporting certain beneficial projects, causes, agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations, so as to establish a specialty license plate for members of the Georgia Tennis Foundation; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; Georgia Tennis Foundation; establish
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Hilton [R] | Rep. David Clark [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] |
Rep. Timothy Barr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-19 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52067 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/171188 |