GA HB684 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state parks and recreational areas generally, so as to authorize the Department of Natural Resources to transfer certain operating responsibilities for state parks and recreational areas to local governing authorities on certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Natural Resources, Department of; transfer certain responsibilities for state parks to local governing authorities; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Sen. George Hooks [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Jay Neal [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #812 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #671 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #671 - Passage (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-30 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-26 | House First Readers | |
2011-12-16 | House Prefiled |