GA HB681 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to competencies and core curriculum relative to quality basic education, so as to provide for a course of study in financial literacy for students in tenth or eleventh grade; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; course of study in financial literacy for students in tenth or eleventh grade; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Yearta [R] | Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Rep. Matt Barton [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #860 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #229 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #229 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-01 | House | House Hopper |