GA HB68 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-14-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to certain military certifications that entitle persons to obtain certain professional licenses, so as to extend the time a member of the military has to qualify for the issuance of a license or certification as an electrical contractor, plumber, conditioned air contractor, low-voltage contractor, or utility contractor using his or her military specialty or certification; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and businesses; certain military certifications; extend time to qualify

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #82 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-02-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-01-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-13HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback