GA HB68 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2A of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to student scholarship organizations, so as to prohibit certain entities from being student scholarship organizations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; prohibit certain entities from being student scholarship organizations
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] |
Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #390 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #399 (Y: 152 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Vote #96 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #399 (Y: 152 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Vote #96 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 130 | |
2019-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |