GA HB675 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Riceboro, approved February 19, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 4614), as amended, so as to revise provisions relating to residency requirements for candidacy for the office of mayor or councilmember; to provide for election by plurality; to revise provisions relating to filling vacancies in the office of mayor or councilmember; to provide for compensation of the mayor pro tempore when serving as mayor; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Riceboro, City of; residency requirements for candidacy for office or mayor or councilmember; revise provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #253 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #229 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #229 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 173 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | House | House Hopper |