GA HB675 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 28-1-8 and Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to salary and allowances of members and officers of the General Assembly and general provisions regarding salaries and fees for public officers, respectively, so as to revise the compensation, expenses, and allowances of certain public officials; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; members and officers; revise compensation, expenses, and allowances
Sponsors
Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. Karla Drenner [D] |
Rep. Susan Holmes [R] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House Hopper |