GA HB674 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alcoholic beverages, so as to provide for Department of Revenue to develop and implement a state-wide, centralized application process for retailers for initial applications and renewals for licenses and permits; to provide for uniform procedures and forms for such online process; to provide for remittance and reporting of application fees; to provide for the State Revenue Commissioner to adopt certain rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; Department of Revenue to develop and implement a state-wide centralized application process for retailers for initial applications and renewals of license and permits; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-26 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56222 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/185881 |