GA HB672 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 14 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to use of speed detection and traffic-control signal monitoring devices, so as to provide for the use of speed detection devices by law enforcement officers employed for the patrol of a public elementary or secondary school; to amend Code Section 40-5-57 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to suspension or revocation of license of habitually negligent or dangerous drivers and point system, so as to provide for the removal of points assessed upon determination that a speed detection device was used in violation of Chapter 14 of Title 40; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; use of speed detection devices by law enforcement officers employed for the patrol of a public elementary or secondary school; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Erica Thomas [D] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] |
Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-18 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-01-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-11 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-10 | House | House Hopper |