GA HB666 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a board of commissioners of roads and revenues for the County of Pike, approved March 17, 1870 (Ga. L. 1870, p. 447), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 25, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4903), so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to provide for election and terms of office of subsequent members; to provide for the submission of this Act for preclearance pursuant to Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pike County; board of commissioners; change description of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #480 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Vote #456 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Vote #456 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Effective Date | |
2014-02-26 | Act 349 | |
2014-02-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-02-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-01-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-01-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-26 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-25 | House | House Hopper |