GA HB653 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 26-4-5 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to the "Georgia Pharmacy Practice Act," so as to revise the definition of "pharmacy care"; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Pharmacy Practice Act; pharmacy care; revise definition
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #379 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #210 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #210 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-06 | Act 240 | |
2021-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House Hopper |