GA HB64 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide that certain officials of Greene County who have served at least 15 years in office may, upon leaving, continue to participate in the county health insurance program for themselves and their dependents by paying the total cost of such participation, approved May 16, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 3664), so as to clarify the qualifications for participation in such health insurance program; to remove the coroner from eligibility to participate in such health insurance program; to prohibit persons who are separated from the county by their commission of an illegal act from participating in such health insurance program; to provide for related maters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Greene County; certain officials; participate in county health insurance program; clarify qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #21 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House Vote #12 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House Vote #12 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-24 | Act 54 | |
2013-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-01-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-01-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-01-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-15 | House | House Hopper |