GA HB624 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Legislative Retirement System, so as to define certain terms; to change certain provisions relating to employee contributions to the retirement system, payment of employee contributions on behalf of the member, and additional contributions; to change certain provisions relating to prior service credit for military service; to change certain provisions relating to eligibility and application for a retirement allowance, early retirement, amount of retirement allowance, compliance with federal tax laws, and increases in retirement allowance; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Legislative Retirement System; define certain terms; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Battles [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Tommy Benton [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Vote #658 (Y: 117 N: 42 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-28 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House Hopper |