GA HB614 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 15 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide for a pilot program for the placement of video monitoring cameras in classrooms providing special education services; to provide for program requirements; to provide for a program evaluation; to provide for funding; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Landon Dunson Act"; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Tommy Benton [R] |
Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #743 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #886 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Vote #603 (Y: 158 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #886 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Vote #603 (Y: 158 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 528 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-10 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-13 | House | House Hopper |