GA HB608 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Cobb County, approved March 26, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 3211), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 27, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 4490), so as to authorize the court to charge a technology fee for each civil case filed, each criminal fine imposed, and each traffic case fined; to specify the uses to which said technology fees may be put; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County State Court; charge technology fee; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Terry Johnson [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
Rep. Judith Manning [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - House Vote #251 - Local Calendar (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-31 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-29 | House First Readers |