GA HB594 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to reincorporate the Town of Waverly Hall in Harris County, approved April 10, 2014 (Ga. L. 2014, p. 3916), so as to authorize the assessment and collection of a technology fee by the Municipal Court of the Town of Waverly Hall; to identify the authorized uses of said technology fee; to provide for the deposit of fees; to provide that the public safety director may authorize use of said fees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waverly Hall, Town of; Municipal Court; authorize assessment and collection of a technology fee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Vote #232 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-18SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-11HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback