GA HB594 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of Baldwin County to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Baldwin County; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Rep. Culver Kidd [I] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #188 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Vote #269 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Vote #269 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 262 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House Hopper |