GA HB593 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the board of commissioners of Washington County, approved August 20, 1913 (Ga. L. 1913, p. 452), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 25, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4454), so as to revise the districts for the election of members of the board of commissioners; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for method of election; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance pursuant to Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Washington County; board of commissioners; revise districts for election of members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #278 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Vote #318 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Vote #318 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 151 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-21 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-12 | House | House Hopper |