GA HB586 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Reynolds; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, powers, and construction; to provide for a governing authority, its election, and terms; to provide for related matters; to provide a specific repealer; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Reynolds, City of; provide a new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Vote #282 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Vote #282 (Y: 153 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Veto V8 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-15 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-14 | House | House Hopper |