GA HB579 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Norcross, Georgia, approved March 28, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 4934), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 3729), so as to change the corporate limits of the City of Norcross; to provide for a referendum; to provide for preclearance under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965; to provide for effective dates and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Norcross, City of; corporate limits; change
Sponsors
Rep. Pedro Marin [D] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #338 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House Vote #251 - Local Calendar (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House Vote #251 - Local Calendar (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-12 | Act 207 | |
2011-05-12 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-21 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-31 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-23 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-22 | House First Readers |