GA HB572 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a chief judge of the Recorder's Court of Chatham County, approved March 31, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 5156), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 27, 1998 (Ga. L. 1998, p. 3557), so as to revise the responsibilities of the chief judge; to revise the method of selection of the chief judge; to provide for a court administrator; to provide for the hiring and discharge of same; to provide for the court administrator's responsibilities; to require the court administrator to provide a bond; to provide personnel policies and procedures of employees of the court; to authorize the adoption of rules, policies, or regulations; to provide for judges pro tempore; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chatham County; Recorder's Court; revise responsibilities of chief judge; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] |
Rep. Craig Gordon [D] | Rep. Edward Stephens [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #202 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Vote #269 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Vote #269 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-04 | Act 144 | |
2017-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-10 | House | House Hopper |