GA HB571 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 6 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to Alzheimer's and Related Dementias State Plan, so as to provide that the Georgia Alzheimer's and Related Dementias State Plan be updated every four years; to provide for a progress report between updates; to revise provisions relating to membership on the advisory council; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Alzheimer's and Related Dementias State Plan; updated every four years; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #414 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #177 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #177 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-23 | House | House Hopper |