GA HB57 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration and licensing of motor vehicles, so as to define certain terms and fees; to change certain provisions relating to motor carrier permitting; to designate the Department of Revenue as the agency responsible for the administration of the federal Unified Carrier Registration Act of 2005; to amend Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public utilities and public transportation, so as to repeal and reserve certain provisions; to provide that identification requirements shall comply with the applicable provisions of the federal Unified Carrier Registration Act of 2005; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; Department of Revenue; administer the federal Unified Carrier Registration Act of 2005; designate
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Murphy [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #460 - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #449 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #298 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House Vote #192 - Pass (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #449 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #298 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House Vote #192 - Pass (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-04 | Act 114 | |
2009-05-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-15 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2009-04-03 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-10 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-16 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-01-15 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-14 | House First Readers |