GA HB565 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 18 of Title 2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Tobacco Community Development Board, so as to eliminate the Georgia Tobacco Community Development Board Overview Committee; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Agriculture; Georgia Tobacco Community Development Board Overview Committee; eliminate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #228 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44462 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/150321 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44462#12521 |