GA HB56 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the number of judges of superior courts, so as to provide for an additional judge of the superior courts of the Blue Ridge Judicial Circuit; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Blue Ridge Judicial Circuit; superior court; provide additional judge
Sponsors
Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Brad Thomas [R] |
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #878 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #823 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #497 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #823 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #497 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-05-02 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 736 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-01-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-01-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-12 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-11 | House | House Hopper |
2020-12-23 | House | House Prefiled |