GA HB559 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Bryan County Public Facilities Authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bryan County Public Facilities Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #194 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Vote #226 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Vote #226 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-02 | Act 14 | |
2019-04-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House Hopper |