GA HB557 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to create and establish the Jackson County Airport Authority," approved June 30, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 2260), as amended, particularly by an Act approved June 3, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 4660), so as to change the manner of appointment of members of the authority; to change the terms of office for such members to staggered, three-year terms of office; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jackson County; Airport Authority; appointment of members; change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #342 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House Vote #93 - Local Calendar (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-11 Effective Date
2009-05-11 Act 282
2009-05-11 House Date Signed by Governor
2009-04-14 House Sent to Governor
2009-04-01 Senate Passed/Adopted
2009-04-01 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2009-03-04 Senate Read and Referred
2009-03-03 House Passed/Adopted
2009-03-03 House Third Readers
2009-03-03 House Committee Favorably Reported
2009-02-26 House Second Readers
2009-02-25 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback