GA HB556 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the merger of the existing independent school system of the City of Athens and the existing school district in the County of Clarke, approved March 7, 1955 (Ga. L. 1955, p. 3057), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 25, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4743), so as to provide for the authority of the superintendent to make certain purchases; to provide for performance bonds related to certain construction projects; to provide for approval of certain purchases by the board of education; to provide for the board of education to modify maximum expenditure amounts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Athens, City of; Clarke County; superintendent to make certain purchases; provide authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #202 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Vote #262 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Vote #262 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-03 | Act 129 | |
2017-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House Hopper |