GA HB556 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the Recorder's Court of Columbus, Georgia, to impose and collect a technology fee for each fine imposed; to specify the uses to which said technology fees may be put; to provide for automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Columbus, City of; Recorder's Court; impose and collect technology fee for each fine imposed
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] |
Rep. John Pezold [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #195 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House Vote #290 (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House Vote #290 (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-07 | Act 297 | |
2013-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-05 | House | House Hopper |