GA HB540 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a homestead exemption from City of Young Harris ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in the amount of $10,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that city; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Young Harris, City of; ad valorem tax for municipal purposes; provide homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Vote #220 - Local Calendar (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Vote #220 - Local Calendar (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Effective Date | |
2011-04-20 | Act 32 | |
2011-04-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-16 | House First Readers |