GA HB534 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-6-22 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to incest, so as to change provisions relating to the relationships between relatives which constitute incest; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Incest; relationships between relatives; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] | Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/44346 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/149781 |