GA HB530 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to students in elementary and secondary education, so as to prohibit parents or guardians from withdrawing or removing a child from a public school for the purpose of avoiding compliance with laws relating to mandatory attendance, school discipline, parental involvement, or parental responsibilities; to provide for additional requirements with regard to declarations of intent; to provide for referral to the Division of Family and Children Services of the Department of Human Services for investigation and enforcement; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; prohibit parents or guardians from withdrawing or removing a child from a public school for the purpose of avoiding compliance with laws relating to mandatory attendance, school discipline, parental involvement, or parental responsibilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #286 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #212 (Y: 135 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback