GA HB53 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the practice of professional forestry, so as to provide that the State Board of Registration for Foresters is an independent state agency attached to the State Forestry Commission for administrative purposes only; to require confirmation of the Senate for members of the State Board of Registration for Foresters appointed by the Governor; to authorize the board to issue cease and desist orders and issue additional penalties for violations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Board of Registration for Foresters; independent state agency; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Sen. Russ Goodman [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #484 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-07 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-23 | House | House Hopper |