GA HB517 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 45-9-81 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions regarding the Georgia State Indemnification Fund, so as to replace the term "National Guard" with the term "organized militia" in the definition of law enforcement officer; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia State Indemnification Fund; replace the term National Guard with the term organized militia in the definition of law enforcement officer
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Morris [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] |
Rep. Todd Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55537 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/183093 |