GA HB506 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend a general Act entitled "An Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the superior courts," approved March 27, 2000 (Ga. L. 2000, p. 205), so as to provide for the selection of the chief judge of the Chattahoochee Judicial Circuit; to provide for terms of office; to provide for filling vacancies in such office; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Chattahoochee Judicial Circuit; provide for selection of chief judge
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. John Pezold [R] |
Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #329 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Vote #231 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Vote #231 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-07 | Act 293 | |
2013-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-27 | House | House Hopper |