GA HB505 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 33 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to physical therapists, so as to revise various provisions regarding the licensure and regulation of physical therapists and physical therapy assistants; to revise definitions; to include additional powers of the State Board of Physical Therapy; to revise provisions regarding use of titles; to revise provisions regarding granting licenses and discipline of licensees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Physical therapists; licensure and regulations of therapists and therapy assistants; revise various provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Robert Gasaway [R] |
Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Dexter Sharper [D] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #374 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #229 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #241 (Y: 151 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #229 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #241 (Y: 151 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 53 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-26 | House | House Hopper |