GA HB504 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 4 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to horns, exhaust systems, mirrors, windshields, tires, safety belts, and energy absorption systems, so as to provide that the failure to use seat safety belts may be admitted into evidence under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; failure to use safety belts may be admitted into evidence under certain circumstances; provide
Sponsors
Rep. B.J. Pak [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2014-02-26 | House | House Postponed |
2014-02-25 | House | House Postponed |
2014-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-27 | House | House Hopper |