GA HB501 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 4 of Title 27 of the O.C.G.A., relating to seafood, so as to provide for mariculture development; to amend Code Section 12-5-295 of the O.C.G.A., relating to applicability of activities in coastal marshlands, so as to revise and add an exemption certain; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; provide for mariculture development

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #205 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #162 (Y: 102 N: 60 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-18SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback