GA HB472 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to driving on right side of roadway, overtaking and passing, and following too closely, so as to provide for an exception for following requirements for vehicles following in a procession when speed of the non-leading, participating vehicles are coordinated automatically; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles and traffic; following requirements for vehicles in a procession when speed is coordinated automatically; provide exception
Sponsors
Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] |
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #352 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #416 (Y: 158 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #223 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #416 (Y: 158 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #223 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 267 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Hopper |