GA HB47 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 7 of Chapter 14 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to foreclosure in general, so as to provide, under certain circumstances, for an opportunity, prior to foreclosure, for a debtor to cure a foreclosure and bring the debt current by making all past due payments along with any late fees and charges; to provide for a method of payment; to provide for a limitation; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Foreclosure; debtor bring debt current by making all past due payments, late fees and charges under certain circumstances; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Darryl Jordan [D] | Rep. Pedro Marin [D] |
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-01-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-14 | House | House Hopper |