GA HB465 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of Putnam County to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Putnam County; levy an excise tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #70 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Vote #84 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12 Effective Date
2015-05-12 Act 226
2015-05-12HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2015-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2015-03-04SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2015-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2015-03-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2015-02-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2015-02-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2015-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2015-02-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2015-02-24HouseHouse First Readers
2015-02-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback