GA HB465 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 17 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenues collected from fines and fees relative to the Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund, so as to provide for a certain employer contribution to such fund; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace Officers' Annuity and Benefit Fund; revenues from fines and fees; employer contribution; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-05 - House - House Vote #140 - Pass (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-11 Senate Recommitted
2009-03-25 Senate Read Second Time
2009-03-25 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2009-03-09 Senate Read and Referred
2009-03-05 House Passed/Adopted
2009-03-05 House Third Readers
2009-02-25 House Committee Favorably Reported
2009-02-19 House Second Readers
2009-02-18 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback