GA HB462 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-07 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Juvenile Code, so as to enact the "Raise the Age Act"; to provide for an implementation committee; to provide for the powers, composition, and appointment of such committee; to change the jurisdiction of the juvenile court to include certain children who are 17 years of age; to amend Titles 15, 16, 17, 27, 37, 42, and 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, crimes and offenses, criminal procedure, game and fish, mental health, penal institutions, and social services, respectively, so as to make conforming cross-references; to provide for effective dates and automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Raise the Age Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Stan Gunter [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Beth Camp [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #162 (Y: 145 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House Hopper |