GA HB462 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-17-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limitations on percent of monthly gross retail receipts derived from certain coin operated amusement machines, monthly verified reports, issuance of fine or revocation or suspension of license for violations, and submission of electronic reports, so as to provide an exception from a limitation on the allowable number of such machines at the same location; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Coin operated amusement machines; limit on number allowed at location; exception
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Rep. Craig Gordon [D] | Rep. Douglas McKillip [D] | Rep. B.J. Pak [R] |
Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #201 - Passage (Y: 140 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-07 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-04 | House First Readers |