GA HB453 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 15 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county law library, so as to add the chief judge of the magistrate court to the board of trustees of the county law library in each county; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
County law library; board of trustees; add chief judge of magistrate court
Sponsors
Rep. David Dreyer [D] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] |
Rep. William Boddie [D] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #245 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #221 (Y: 165 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #221 (Y: 165 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 212 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Hopper |