GA HB450 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to courts in general, so as to provide for the reestablishment of the Criminal Case Data Exchange Board as an advisory board to the Administrative Office of the Courts;to amend Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to provide for compliance with data transmission requirements; to provide for required reports; to amend Chapter 25 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Technology Authority, so as to provide for release of funds from the technology empowerment fund, subject to certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; reestablishment of Criminal Case Data Exchange Board; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Gunter [R] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] |
Rep. Matt Reeves [R] | Rep. Rob Leverett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House Hopper |