GA HB447 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act known as the "Macon Water Authority Act," approved March 23, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 4991), as amended, so as to change the compensation of members of the authority; to provide for future changes in compensation; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Macon Water Authority Act; change compensation of members; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #70 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Vote #84 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Vote #84 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 219 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-23 | House | House Hopper |